This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:53:52 (UTC).

Villagio At Happy Valley Condominium Association VS Dana M Helmer Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Villagio At Happy Valley Condominium Association filed an Other lawsuit against Dana M Helmer. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephens, Sherry. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1690

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Stephens, Sherry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villagio At Happy Valley Condominium Association

Defendants

Dana M Helmer

Joshua T Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Brown

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket049 - ME: Judgment Signed (docket date:2/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: Default Hearing; Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Villagio At Happy Valley Condominium Association Judgment Against: Joshua T Davis Judgment Against: Dana M Helmer, Amount: $8,989.06, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Villagio At Happy Valley Condominium Association Judgment Against: Joshua T Davis Judgment Against: Dana M Helmer, Amount: $925.37, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Villagio At Happy Valley Condominium Association Judgment Against: Joshua T Davis Judgment Against: Dana M Helmer, Amount: $2,368.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketJOR - Judgment And Order (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTE: HEARING SET RE Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:1/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Motion and Affidavit for Foreclosure Judgment by Default with Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Default; Affidavit on Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOSHUA T DAVIS AND DANA M HELMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less