This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 21:22:48 (UTC).

Vicky A Ramirez VS Jose R Ramirez Montijo

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Vicky A Ramirez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Jose R Ramirez Montijo. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rassas, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3266

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rassas, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Vicky A Ramirez

Vicky A Vela Garcia

Respondent

Jose R Ramirez Montijo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/09/2021

JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2021

DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2021

DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:2/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2021

DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:1/25/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2020

DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:1/6/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020

DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2020

DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:12/18/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:12/18/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:12/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:11/18/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020

DocketNOTE: TO EXTEND DISMISSAL DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020

DocketORD - Order (docket date:10/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2020

DocketNOTE: TO EXTEND DISMISSAL DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2020

DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:10/21/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2020

DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:9/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:7/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:7/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:7/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:7/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:7/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less