This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/03/2016 at 00:41:31 (UTC).

Vicki Mead Et Al VS Roger Duane Patterson Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2011 Vicki Mead filed an Other lawsuit against Roger Duane Patterson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Udall, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0034

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Udall, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vicki Mead

Steven Gerald Todd

William Serrano

Blanca Meza

Defendants

Roger Duane Patterson

Kay Automotive Distributors Inc

Nicole K Patterson

General Motors Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Larry Cohen

Kevin Chapman

Mack Jones

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Cronin

C Fischer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2013
  • DocketNRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit (docket date:8/6/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • DocketNOTE: $75.00 / MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • DocketODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:6/19/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • DocketNOTE: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketSFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:6/13/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketNOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:4/24/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • DocketNOTE: Motion to Appear Telephonically at the April 29, 2013 Settlement Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketNOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:4/10/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketNOTE: CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:2/18/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/22/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DocketNOTE: ROGER DUANE PATTERSON AND NICOLE K PATTERSON 02/13/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • DocketCCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:2/17/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:2/16/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • DocketNOTE: PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/14/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketNOTE: KAY AUTOMOTIVE DISTRIBUTORS INC SERVED 01/06/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/5/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:1/5/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less