This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/04/2021 at 16:57:33 (UTC).

Velocity Investments L L C VS Maryna Leyvas

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Velocity Investments L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Maryna Leyvas. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is White, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1679

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

White, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velocity Investments L L C

Defendant

Maryna Leyvas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannon Crane

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Velocity Investments L L C Judgment Against: Maryna Leyvas, Amount: $10,763.55, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Velocity Investments L L C Judgment Against: Maryna Leyvas, Amount: $412.80, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:2/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Request for Default Judgment Without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Statement of CostS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for and Affidavit on Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MARYNA LEYVAS / J DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less