This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:52:31 (UTC).

Velocity Investments L L C VS Daniel Guerrero

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Velocity Investments L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Daniel Guerrero. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1671

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velocity Investments L L C

Defendant

Daniel Guerrero

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannon Crane

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Statement of Costs and Notice of Taxation of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Request for ENTRY OF Default Judgment Without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for and Affidavit on Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DANIEL GUERRERO AND J DOE SPOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less