This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/13/2016 at 05:21:26 (UTC).

Vantage West Credit Union VS Scott Dandrea

Case Summary

On 05/14/2013 Vantage West Credit Union filed an Other lawsuit against Scott Dandrea. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Benny, Margaret. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0527

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Benny, Margaret

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vantage West Credit Union

Defendant

Scott Dandrea

Other

Safeway Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Bursey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/06/2014

JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal (docket date:6/6/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2014

NOTE: JUDGMENT DISCHARGING GARNISHEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2014

NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy (docket date:6/9/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2014

MOT - Motion (docket date:6/2/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2014

NOTE: Motion and Order for Judgment Discharging Garnishee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2014

OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien (docket date:3/31/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2014

NOTE: ON NONEXEMPT EARNINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2014

APL - Application (docket date:3/20/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2014

NOTE: APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF/JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN ON NON-EXEMPT EARNINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2014

CER - Certificate (docket date:3/5/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
07/22/2013

023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:7/22/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2013

AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:7/18/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2013

NOTE: Application For Entry of Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2013

SUM - Summons (docket date:6/4/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2013

SUM - Summons (docket date:6/4/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2013

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/5/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2013

NOTE: SCOTT DANDREA AND JANE DOE DANDREA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2013

COM - Complaint (docket date:5/15/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2013

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:5/15/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2013

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/15/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less