This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 20:08:05 (UTC).

Vantage West Credit Union VS Alan Valdez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Vantage West Credit Union filed an Other lawsuit against Alan Valdez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5220

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vantage West Credit Union

Defendant

Alan Valdez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Pursley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ALAN VALDEZ AND J DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less