This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:00:25 (UTC).

Valley Anesthesiology Consultants Inc VS Lee A Kimball Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Valley Anesthesiology Consultants Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Lee A Kimball. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Warner, Randall and Thomason, Timothy. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1711

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Warner, Randall

Thomason, Timothy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valley Anesthesiology Consultants Inc

Defendants

Raquel B Kimball

Lee A Kimball

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron Lloyd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less