This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:18:01 (UTC).

V E T M Land L L C Et Al VS Pima County

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 V E T M Land L L C filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Pima County. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0481

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

V E T M Land L L C

V E T M, L L C

Defendant

Pima County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Lenihan

Defendant Attorney

David Krula

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • STJ - Stipulated Judgment (docket date:1/3/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:12/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • NOTE: Stipulation for Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • 375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • NOTE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:10/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTE: FIRST AMENDED AND RESTATED COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF 2018 PROPERTY TAX APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:9/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE FOR FILING JOINT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:5/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • NOTE: Defendant Pima Countys Answer to Complaint and Notice of 2018 Property Tax Appeal // CO-CHG $222 R#25962745

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:5/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • NOTE: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • AFF - Affidavit (docket date:5/1/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • NOTE: OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Judgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less