Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 19:51:47 (UTC).

Union Hills Country Club VS Roberta Nielson Couch Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2010 Union Hills Country Club filed an Other lawsuit against Roberta Nielson Couch. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Moskowitz, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3322

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Moskowitz, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Union Hills Country Club

Defendants

Roberta Nielson Couch

Janie R Faetini

Carlyn K Haun

Leta J Lyon

Carl F Faetini

Ionia V Bailey

Nicola Acquavella

Jesceille M Ashenfelder

Francis E Picciano

David L Japhet

Lillian M Stryker

George Robert Couch

Loyal M Haun

P Sharon Powell

J Edwin Clark

William R Murphy

Ruth A August

William G Stryker

Catherine Ann Larson

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Sahl

Defendant Attorney

Philip McKenney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2011
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:5/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • NOTE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • 049 - ME: Judgment Signed (docket date:4/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:5/2/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:3/21/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • NOTE: Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants Motion to Recover Costs of Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • AFF - Affidavit (docket date:3/15/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • NOTE: REPLY AFFIDAVIT OF PHILIP M. McKENNEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO RECOVER COSTS OF SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • STA - Statement (docket date:3/15/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2010
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • NOTE: LOYAL M HAUN AND CARLYN HAUN 06/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • RES - Response (docket date:7/1/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • NOTE: Response to Motion to Transfer Case to Northwest Regional Judicial District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2010
  • MTT - Motion To Transfer (docket date:6/18/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2010
  • NOTE: TO NORTHWEST REGIONAL JUDICIAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2010
  • NAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:6/28/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2010
  • CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:6/30/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/27/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/27/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less