This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 06:39:59 (UTC).

Unifund C C R, L L C VS Michael T Mahoney

Case Summary

On 04/21/2014 Unifund C C R, L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Michael T Mahoney. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2382

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund C C R, L L C

Defendant

Michael T Mahoney

Other

Desert Schools F C U

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexander Ward

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2014

ORD - Order (docket date:10/10/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2014

NOTE: ORDER RELEASING NON-EARNINGS GARNISHMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2014

PTT - Petition (docket date:10/7/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2014

NOTE: Petition for Release of Non-Earnings Garnishment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2014

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:9/24/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2014

ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:9/15/2014) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(3))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2014

ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:9/11/2014) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(3))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2014

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/9/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2014

WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons (docket date:9/5/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2014

AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:8/29/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
06/20/2014

NOTE: Motion and Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment by Default and Without Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2014

023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:5/22/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2014

AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:5/19/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2014

NOTE: Application and Affidavit for Default and Notice of Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2014

SUM - Summons (docket date:5/2/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2014

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/8/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2014

NOTE: MICHAEL T MAHONEY AND JANE DOE MAHONEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2014

COM - Complaint (docket date:4/22/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2014

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:4/22/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2014

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/22/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less