Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 05:56:12 (UTC).

U S Bank Cust/sass Muni V I, D T R Et Al VS First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2014 U S Bank Cust/sass Muni filed an Other lawsuit against I, D T R. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Warner, Randall. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2151

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Warner, Randall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U S Bank Cust/sass Muni V I, D T R

U S Bank Cust/ S A S S, M U N I, V I, D T R

Defendants

First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company

Valentine Consulting Defined Benefit Plan

Pegasus Airpark Development Corp

Pegasus Airpark H O A

Ernesto Q Avitia

Eloina Avitia

Bank Of New York Mellon, The

Paul Petersen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Becker

Defendant Attorney

J Mackinlay

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2015
  • 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal (docket date:8/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:5/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees (docket date:5/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • NOTE: AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEYS FEES AND STATEMENT OF COSTS AS TO DEFENDANTS AVITIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:4/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • NOTE: EX PARTE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS PEGASUS AIRPARK DEVELOPMENT CORP., AN ARIZONA CORPORATION, PEGASUS AIRPARK HOA AND PETERSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:4/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:1/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • NOTE: Answer to Complaint / E-FILE BILLING $237

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2014
  • NOTE: PEGASUS AIRPARK DEVELOPMENT CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • NOTE: FIRST CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:10/7/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • NOTE: Ex Parte Notice of Dismissal AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:7/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:7/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:7/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less