Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 22:54:00 (UTC).

U S Bank C U S T / S A S S, M U N I, V I, D T R VS M A C W C P, I I, L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2014 U S Bank C U S T / S A S S, M U N I filed an Other lawsuit against I, D T R. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gass, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0540

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gass, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S Bank C U S T / S A S S, M U N I, V I, D T R

Defendants

M A C W C P, I I, L L C

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Oliver C Uribe

Xuanita A Uribe

City Of Phoenix

Ambrosio Balderrama

Martin Martinez

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

H D Investment Properties L L C

Elvia Santeliz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Becker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:2/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • NOTE: Ex Parte Notice of Dismissal AS TO DEFENDANTS HD INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, L.L.C. AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION FOR GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING INC.,(PARCEL 105-01-096)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal (docket date:10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:8/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:7/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:4/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:4/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:4/1/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • NOTE: Ex Parte Notice of Dismissal AS TO DEFENDANTS URIBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:3/6/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2015
  • NOTE: Affidavit OF Out of State Service AS TO DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2006-3K MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/5/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • NOTE: ELVIA SANTELIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • NOTE: certificate of compulsory Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • NOTE: Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:11/5/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:11/5/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:11/5/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less