Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 16:55:29 (UTC).

Troyer Installation And Hardware L L C VS Raymond J Poncia Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2008 Troyer Installation And Hardware L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Raymond J Poncia. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Hannah, John. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4290

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Hannah, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Troyer Installation And Hardware L L C

Defendants

Raymond J Poncia

Barbara Marsh

Robert F Joslin

Robert J Smeath

Marilyn Gillespie Davis

Stephen L Capece

Troy Smith

Treeview L L C

Marvin L Schmidt

Thomas Y Hartley

Victoria L Sabia

Robert C Bisnett

Robert S Jaye

Judean A Schmidt

William R Godfrey

Charles Howard

Kravitz Schnitzer And Sloane Chtd 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan And Trust

Others

Wells Fargo Bank Arizona N A

M & I Marshal & Ilsley Bank

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frederick Thomas

Other Attorneys

J Cahill

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2010
  • 039 - ME: Judgment Debtor Exam (docket date:1/28/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/12/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee (docket date:1/21/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • APL - Application (docket date:12/10/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON GARNISHMENT PURSUANT TO ARS 12-1584

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • ORD - Order (docket date:12/9/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • NOTE: RELEASING GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:12/8/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear (docket date:11/27/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:12/8/2009) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(45))

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2008
  • NOTE: VOLUNTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/7/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • NOTE: M & I MARSHAL AND ILSLEY BANK SERVED 11-04-08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/7/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • NOTE: SANCTUARY DESIGN L L C SERVED 11-04-08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:11/12/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:11/6/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:11/6/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:11/6/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • NOTE: LIS PENDENS PURSUANT TO ARS 12-1191 AND 33-998

    Read MoreRead Less