This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:00:51 (UTC).

Troy Flowers VS Jesus Ivan Perea Garcia

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Troy Flowers filed an Other lawsuit against Jesus Ivan Perea Garcia. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1716

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Troy Flowers

Defendant

Jesus Ivan Perea Garcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin McCarthy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less