This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:02:14 (UTC).

Triwest Healthcare Alliance Corp VS Phoenix Eye Surgical Center L L C

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Triwest Healthcare Alliance Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Phoenix Eye Surgical Center L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Mahoney, Margaret and Thomason, Timothy. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1734

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Mahoney, Margaret

Thomason, Timothy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Triwest Healthcare Alliance Corp

Defendant

Phoenix Eye Surgical Center L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Spencer

Defendant Attorney

Bradley Shelts

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTE: GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:1/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:1/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set (docket date:1/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference; Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Motion for Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:1/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set (docket date:12/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer to Counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance of Service / PHOENIX EYE SURGICAL CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less