This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 06:17:16 (UTC).

Trang Pham VS Adrian Howard Parker

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Trang Pham filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Adrian Howard Parker. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Astrowsky, Brad. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5668

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Astrowsky, Brad

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Trang Pham

Respondent

Adrian Howard Parker

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

Elizabeth Westby

Adam Rieth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • Docket926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling (docket date:2/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement (docket date:12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • HearingEvent: Trial/Evidentiary Hearing; Result: Trial/Evh Held-Petition Concluded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO WITHDRAW PETITIONERS APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT FILED ON 11/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Response to Petition to Enforce Agreement or in the Alternative, Petition to Establish Paternity, Legal Decision-Making, Parenting Time and Child Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketRES - Response (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR FILING DOMESTIC CONTRACT WITH COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAFF - Affidavit (docket date:12/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED / FOR RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PETITIONERS MOTION FOR ORDER TO APPEAR FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS RE LEGAL DECISION MAKING PARENTING TIME CHILD SUPPORT AND ATTORNEYS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less