Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 20:02:31 (UTC).

Tracy Cole Et Al VS D R Horton Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2014 Tracy Cole filed an Other lawsuit against D R Horton Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bergin, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9356

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bergin, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tracy Cole

Cozy Place L L C

Timothy Crane

Casey Crane

Douglas Gilmore

Cheryl Gilmore

Dawn Jones

Ricardo Martinez

Ignacio Mireles

Susana Mireles

Ed Ricks

Donna Ricks

Stanley Robinson

Alex Robles

Yolanda Robles

Jacqueline Rumney

Dennis Rumney

Diana Davison

Russell Davison

Sandra L Salwei Trust

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodney Galarza

Other Attorneys

Jason Mullis

Rosary Hernandez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2016
  • 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont (docket date:4/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont (docket date:3/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:1/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • NOTE: Joint Stipulation Re Plaintiff's Fees and Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • 003 - ME: Hearing Reset (docket date:12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • REL - Reply (docket date:12/1/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • NOTE: REPLY RE: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DR HORTONS REQUEST TO DISMISS ARBITRATION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION OF THE AMERICAN ARBITRATION ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • RES - Response (docket date:11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • NOTE: D.R. Horton's Limited Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Notice in Compliance with October 30th Minute Entry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • RES - Response (docket date:11/4/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • NOTE: CONTINENTAL HOMES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • NOTE: CHI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:7/3/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:7/3/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:7/3/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:7/3/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • CER - Certificate (docket date:7/3/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • NOTE: REGARDING TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less