This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 01:02:49 (UTC).

Toni Arquette Noel Malgrat VS John Ralph Malgrat

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Toni Arquette Noel Malgrat filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against John Ralph Malgrat. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Ireland, Jacki and Edelstein, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4119

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Ireland, Jacki

Edelstein, Monica

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Toni Arquette Noel Malgrat

Respondent

John Ralph Malgrat

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:2/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:11/16/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/27/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:10/5/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less