This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 16:59:58 (UTC).

Tolleson Meadows Homeowners Association VS Jaime Ramirez Garcia

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Tolleson Meadows Homeowners Association filed an Other lawsuit against Jaime Ramirez Garcia. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is McCoy, M. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1704

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

McCoy, M. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tolleson Meadows Homeowners Association

Defendant

Jaime Ramirez Garcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Brown

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less