This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 14:52:14 (UTC).

Todd Laurent VS Ahmed Yusuf Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2010 Todd Laurent filed an Other lawsuit against Ahmed Yusuf. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Udall, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0618

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Udall, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Todd Laurent

Defendants

Ahmed Yusuf

Total Transit Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Alston

Defendant Attorney

John Elardo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/01/2011

ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:8/2/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2011

NOTE: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2011

SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:7/27/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2011

NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2011

NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:6/15/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2011

NOTE: Notice of Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2011

NOT - Notice (docket date:5/25/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2011

NOTE: Notice of Service of Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2011

019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:4/22/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2011

NOT - Notice (docket date:4/7/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
03/05/2010

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:3/9/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2010

NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:3/9/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2010

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/1/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2010

NOTE: TOTAL TRANSIT INC SERVED 02/24/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2010

SUM - Summons (docket date:3/1/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2010

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/24/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2010

NOTE: AHMED YUSUF AND JANE DOE YUSUF SERVED 02/22/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2010

SUM - Summons (docket date:2/25/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2010

COM - Complaint (docket date:2/23/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2010

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:2/23/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less