Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/31/2018 at 22:30:23 (UTC).

Tiffany Parker Et Al VS Hancock-M T H Communities Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2014 Tiffany Parker filed an Other lawsuit against Hancock-M T H Communities Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, Aimee. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0717

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, Aimee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tiffany Parker

John McLeod

Alana De Jesus

Margie S Loy Trust

Grady Fitzwater

Gregory Clemmons

Windy Formica

Tom Wleklik

Maria Quintero

Mary Gabaldon

Bernie Gabaldon

Noel Ruane

Emilio Tejeda

Jeany Sadlier

Gema Zavala

Casimiro Santillan

Marguerite Davis

Davind Cubillas

Penny Sawyer

Josephine Worthan

143 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lucas Edwards

Other Attorneys

Dennis Wilenchik

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2015
  • 053 - ME: Case Consolidation (docket date:2/2/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • 022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:1/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • ORD - Order (docket date:1/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • NOTE: SCHEDULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • JSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:1/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • NOTE: Rule 16(B)(2) Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • MCD - Motion To Consolidate (docket date:12/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • NOTE: Meritage Homes' Motion to Consolidate CV2013-002312, CV2013-002313, CV2014-050717, And CV2014-050816 With CV2013-001449

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/5/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • REL - Reply (docket date:10/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2014
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:8/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • NOTE: MERITAGE HOMES OF ARIZONA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • NOTE: HANCOCK-MTH COMMMUNITIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:4/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • CER - Certificate (docket date:4/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • NOTE: REGARDING EXPERT TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less