Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/11/2016 at 11:02:42 (UTC).

Thomas B Smith Et Al VS Chris Chandler Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2015 Thomas B Smith filed an Other lawsuit against Chris Chandler. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Benny, Margaret. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5924

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Benny, Margaret

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas B Smith

Sandra E Yee-Smith

Ronald Banford

Veronica Banford

Suzanne A Beckles

Defendants

Chris Chandler

Full Moon Capital

Kensington Holdings

Alan Wayne Strebeck

Linda Joyce Strebeck

Strebecks Synergy Group

Other

Preston Jay Strebeck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Anderson

Other Attorney

Matthew Hafen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2016
  • NAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:1/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • NOTE: Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:1/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • NOTE: Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(a)(8) and Request for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee (docket date:1/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • NOTE: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:1/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:1/6/2016) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(12))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:1/6/2016) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(12))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2015
  • WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons (docket date:11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • NOTE: Waiver and Acceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:11/18/2015) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(12))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:11/18/2015) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(12))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • NFJ - Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment (docket date:11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less