This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/22/2021 at 16:08:20 (UTC).

Theodore J Goldstein VS Daniella Goldstein

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Theodore J Goldstein filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Daniella Goldstein. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaney, Scott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2335

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Blaney, Scott

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Theodore J Goldstein

Respondent

Daniella Goldstein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:12/8/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:12/1/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/29/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less