This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/19/2016 at 16:50:26 (UTC).

The Lincoln National Life In VS Futurenext Inc

Case Summary

On 03/15/2002 The Lincoln National Life In filed an Other lawsuit against Futurenext Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Hannah, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5033

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Hannah, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Lincoln National Life In

Defendant

Futurenext Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elliot Wernick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/08/2003

042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:4/8/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2002

RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:5/17/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2002

RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:3/11/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2002

LET - Letter (docket date:5/17/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2002

314 - ME: Bankruptcy (docket date:10/17/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2002

NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy (docket date:2/26/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2002

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:8/20/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2002

SUM - Summons (docket date:7/11/2002) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2002

NOT - Notice (docket date:5/10/2002) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2002

NOTE: OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2002

ADE - Application For Default (docket date:5/10/2002) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2002

AFD - Affidavit On Default (docket date:5/10/2002) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2002

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/5/2002)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2002

NOTE: P2 SERVED 3-19-2002

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2002

COM - Complaint (docket date:3/20/2002) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2002

CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:3/20/2002) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less