This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:11:30 (UTC).

Tesla Nicole Thompson

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Tesla Nicole Thompson was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Popham, Jr, Gary and Lynch, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5183

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Popham, Jr, Gary

Lynch, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tesla Nicole Thompson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MARITAL / OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketWAV - Waiver (docket date:11/10/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: REGARDING APPLICATION FOR CHANGE OF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:11/10/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of order mailed/provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOCN - Order Change of Name (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less