This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/02/2020 at 09:28:30 (UTC).

Teresa Lopez VS Sergio Navarro

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Teresa Lopez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Sergio Navarro. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Nicholls, Suzanne. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5680

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Nicholls, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Teresa Lopez

Respondent

Sergio Navarro

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kristen Dewitt-Lopez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:10/22/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:10/23/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/22/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less