Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/05/2016 at 08:31:35 (UTC).

Tax Lien Services L L C VS Christa Walander Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2015 Tax Lien Services L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Christa Walander. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2374

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tax Lien Services L L C

Defendants

Christa Walander

Juanita Martinez

Gabriel Martinez

Arizona Registrar Of Contractors

City Of Phoenix

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

United States Of America Internal Revenue Service

State Of Arizona

Robert Brown

Terri Brown

Hallcraft Villas West Five Townhouse Association

D B Home Lending L L C

Clarence E Newman

Abel Parra Hernandez

Citigroup Inc

Pacific Gold Mortgage Group L L C

James Gard

Quantum Resource Group L P

Cach L L C

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heather Hendrix

Other Attorneys

Steven Palmer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2016
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:1/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • JOR - Judgment And Order (docket date:12/4/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • NOTE: ORDER OF JUDGMENT; QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment (docket date:11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • NOTE: STIPULATION TO JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:9/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:9/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • NOTE: ORDER TO DISMISS CERTAIN LISTED DEFENDANTS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:8/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • NOTE: STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN LISTED DEFENDANTS ONLY; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN LISTED DEFENDANTS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2015
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:5/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • NOTE: QUANTUM RESOURCES GROUP LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:5/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:5/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:5/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:5/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:4/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less