This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/21/2020 at 04:34:55 (UTC).

Tammy Lynn Stephens VS Travis Howard Stephens

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Tammy Lynn Stephens filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Travis Howard Stephens. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kiefer, Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1028

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kiefer, Joseph

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tammy Lynn Stephens

Respondent

Travis Howard Stephens

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/30/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/16/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less