This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/19/2019 at 14:35:00 (UTC).

Surprise Farms I I I Community Association, The VS Howard T Hodges Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 Surprise Farms I I I Community Association, The filed an Other lawsuit against Howard T Hodges. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohen, Bruce. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6025

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Cohen, Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Surprise Farms I I I Community Association, The

Defendants

Howard T Hodges

Jennifer Hodges

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy Stratman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/18/2019

SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:4/19/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

NOTE: Plaintiff's Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2019

JUD - Judgment (docket date:1/18/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2019

NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

SOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:1/11/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

NOTE: Plaintiff's Statement of CostS and Notice of Taxation of Costs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

NOT - Notice (docket date:1/11/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

NOTE: Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging OF PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:1/11/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure AND ORDER of Sale

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
11/06/2018

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/13/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2018

NOTE: HOWARD T HODGES III

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2018

SUM - Summons (docket date:11/8/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2018

SUM - Summons (docket date:11/8/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2018

COM - Complaint (docket date:10/17/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2018

CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:10/17/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2018

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:10/17/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2019

Judgment For: Surprise Farms I I I Community Association, The Judgment Against: Jennifer Hodges Judgment Against: Howard T Hodges III, Amount: $3,452.46, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2019

Judgment For: Surprise Farms I I I Community Association, The Judgment Against: Jennifer Hodges Judgment Against: Howard T Hodges III, Amount: $651.50, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2019

Judgment For: Surprise Farms I I I Community Association, The Judgment Against: Jennifer Hodges Judgment Against: Howard T Hodges III, Amount: $1,460.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee, Status: Satisfied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less