This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/26/2016 at 09:23:34 (UTC).

Sunrise Bank Of Arizona VS Building Development System L P Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2008 Sunrise Bank Of Arizona filed an Other lawsuit against Building Development System L P. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Oberbillig, Robert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4712

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Oberbillig, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunrise Bank Of Arizona

Defendants

Building Development System L P

Anthem Community Council Inc

Margaret L James

Tara-Lyn Ford

Thomas R Ford

Ray Palmer

Donnis J Herndon

Eric Nichols

Lance Herndon

Frederick G James

Danielle Nichols

Assignee

S M S Financial J D C, L P

3Rd Party Defendant

Capitol Bancorp Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Allen

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Melanie McBride

Assignee Attorney

Barbara Maroney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2015
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NOTE: PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL RELEASE OF LIEN AS TO FREDERICK G. JAMES AND MARGARET L. JAMES AT TO JUDGMENT DATED AUGUST 14, 2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NOTE: PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL RELEASE OF LIEN AS TO FREDERICK G. JAMES AND MARGARET L. JAMES AT TO JUDGMENT DATED SEPTEMBER 12, 2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:10/1/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • NOTE: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:6/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:6/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • NOTE: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGEMENT LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
560 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • NOTE: ERIC J NICHOLS AND DANIELLE R NICHOLS SERVED 10-09-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • NOTE: THOMAS R FORD AND TARA-LYNN FORD SERVED 10-09-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • NOTE: ANTHEM COMMUNITY COUNCIL INC SERVED 10-09-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:10/9/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:10/9/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:10/9/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less