Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 05:17:35 (UTC).

Sunny Whiteside VS Mary Anne Andrews Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2009 Sunny Whiteside filed an Other lawsuit against Mary Anne Andrews. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0907

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunny Whiteside

Defendants

Mary Anne Andrews

Atc/vancom Inc

Shuttleport Holdings L L C

Thrifty Rent A Car System Inc

Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group Inc

Veolia Transportation Services Inc

Veolia Transportation Phoenix

Atc/vancom Of Arizona Limited Partnership

Shuttleport Services Arizona L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Zachar

Defendant Attorneys

PHILLIP STANFIELD

G Spiess

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2010
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:7/6/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • NOTE: WITH PRJEUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:6/24/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • 022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:12/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel (docket date:12/16/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:12/10/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:12/10/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:12/17/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:12/8/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2009
  • NOTE: SHUTTLEPORT SERVICES ARIZONA LLC SERVED 2-27-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • NOTE: ATC/VANCOM INC SERVED 2-27-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:2/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less