This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 09:58:07 (UTC).

Stephanie E Loxton VS Wade T Loxton

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Stephanie E Loxton filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Wade T Loxton. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kiefer, Joseph. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0861

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kiefer, Joseph

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stephanie E Loxton

Respondent

Wade T Loxton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/26/2021

JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:1/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:1/27/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2021

DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2021

DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:1/13/2021) (filing party: Respondent(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2020

DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:11/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:9/1/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:7/27/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:7/27/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:7/27/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:7/27/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:7/27/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less