Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 10:59:38 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Et Al VS Mario Sanchez-Rios

Case Summary

On 11/14/2014 State Of Arizona filed an Other lawsuit against Mario Sanchez-Rios. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bustamante, Lori. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3846

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bustamante, Lori

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State Of Arizona

William G Montgomery

M Lando Voyles

Claimants

Micro Source L L C

Overstock Online L L C

Eduardo Velazquez-Maory

Amzn Tech Group L L C

Justin Earl Harrison

Eduardo Luis Velazquez

Jorge Alan Solano-Gonzalez

Eduardo Velazquez-Meory

Carlos Amando Ponce Molina

Sofia Velazquez

Yvette Velazquez-Lopez

Technology Solutions Online Ltd

Joseph Sorbara

Global Electronic Recycling L L C

Microsoft Corporation

David Fletes

Defendant

Mario Sanchez-Rios

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Mahon

Claimant Attorneys

Kristen Curry

Philippe Martinet

Michael Kimerer

James Kneller

Booker Evans

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Dessaules

Other Attorneys

Carlie Tovrea

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2016
  • ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal (docket date:4/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • CAO - Court Of Appeals Order (docket date:4/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • NOTE: ORDER DENYING MOTION AND DISMISSING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • ORD - Order (docket date:4/8/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • NOTE: ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY BETWEEN THE STATE AND THE CLAIMANTS/DEFENDANTS (Stayed Until Defendants' Criminal Trials are Complete)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:4/5/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Stay Discovery Between the State and the Claimants/ Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:4/5/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Stay Discovery Between the State and the Claimants/Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:4/1/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2014
  • NOTE: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:12/10/2014) (filing party: Claimant(10))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:12/5/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • NOTE: Claim for Remission of Property R#24184033 $237.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • CLM - Claim (docket date:12/5/2014) (filing party: Claimant(10))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • NOTE: State's Motion to Modify Seizure Warrant Re: Wells Fargo Cashier's Check number 604001815

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • NPF - Notice/Pending Forfeiture (docket date:11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:11/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less