Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 06:24:07 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Et Al VS Brandon David Dowell Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2015 State Of Arizona filed an Other lawsuit against Brandon David Dowell. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bustamante, Lori. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0226

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bustamante, Lori

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State Of Arizona

Mark Brnovich

Claimants

Robert A Fangmeier

Jeffery Lee Abbott

James Lester Abbott

Tobias John Murrillo

Vicki Abbott

Evil Inside Clothing L L C

Defendants

Brandon David Dowell

Connie Will

Phillip Lamonica

In Re

$4,398.00 U S Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Rothblum

Claimant Attorney

Wendy Reasons

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2016
  • ORD - Order (docket date:5/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:5/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • NOTE: Stipulated Motion To Stay Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure (docket date:4/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel (docket date:4/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • NOTE: LIMITED MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:4/5/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/8/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • NOTE: PHILLIP LAMONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2016
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:1/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • SCM - Subsequent Complaint (docket date:10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • NOTE: Verified Complaint In Personam & In Rem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:9/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • CLM - Claim (docket date:9/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • NOTE: VERIFIED CLAIM FOR PROPERTY REGARDING STATES NOTICE OF PENDING FORFEITURE AND NOTICE OF SEIZURE FOR FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:9/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • NPF - Notice/Pending Forfeiture (docket date:8/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:8/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less