This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 10:58:51 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Transportation Motor Vehicle Division VS David W Calvert

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Transportation Motor Vehicle Division filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against David W Calvert. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0125

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Transportation Motor Vehicle Division

Defendant

David W Calvert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lindsay Hughes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2017
  • DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:7/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:7/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • NOTE: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT HEARING AND AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:6/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:6/7/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • NOTE: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND RE: MILITARY SERVICE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • NOTE: DAVID W CALVERT DBA CALVERT TRUCKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:5/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Transportation Motor Vehicle Division Judgment Against: David W Calvert, Amount: $7,751.63, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Transportation Motor Vehicle Division Judgment Against: David W Calvert, Amount: $1,765.73, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Transportation Motor Vehicle Division Judgment Against: David W Calvert, Amount: $2,008.20, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less