This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:03:18 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Stephanie E Feil

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Stephanie E Feil. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0244

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendant

Stephanie E Feil

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shyla Freestone

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:5/9/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:4/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • NOTE: Motion for Default Judgment without Hearing and Affidavit in Support of Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:4/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:4/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • NOTE: Application for Entry of Default and Re Military Service Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • NOTE: STEPHANIE E FEIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:3/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Stephanie E Feil, Amount: $11,103.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Stephanie E Feil, Amount: $1,144.89, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Stephanie E Feil, Amount: $1,188.04, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less