This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:08:22 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Scott L Saylor Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Scott L Saylor. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0298

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Scott L Saylor

Sharla R Saylor

Colleen Saylor

John Doe Saylor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shyla Freestone

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:2/1/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • NOTE: Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:9/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:9/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • NOTE: Application for Entry of Default and Re Military Service Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:8/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • NOTE: Notice of Amended Caption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:8/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • NOTE: SCOTT L SAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • NOTE: COLLEEN SAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • NOTE: JOHN DOE SAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/8/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • NOTE: SHARLA R SAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:6/5/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:6/5/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less