This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 10:59:02 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Sarah L Searle Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Sarah L Searle. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0130

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Sarah L Searle

Nathan R Searle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shyla Freestone

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2017
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:8/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • NOTE: JUDGMENT AS TO SARAH L. SEARLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:8/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:8/4/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • NOTE: Motion for Default Judgment without Hearing and Affidavit in Support of Motion As to Nathan R. Searle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:8/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Judgment As To Sarah L Searle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:7/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2017
  • NOTE: NATHAN R SEARLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Nathan R Searle, Amount: $5,651.03, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Nathan R Searle, Amount: $1,642.95, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Nathan R Searle, Amount: $880.23, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Sarah L Searle, Amount: $5,651.03, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Sarah L Searle, Amount: $1,642.95, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Sarah L Searle, Amount: $864.85, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less