This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 10:51:03 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Rose Brkic Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Rose Brkic. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0007

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Rose Brkic

Alfred Beseler

Mindy Homes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lindsay Hughes

Defendant Attorney

Andre Carman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2018
  • WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons (docket date:2/9/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:2/2/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • NOTE: Release and Quash of Writ of Garnishment (Non-Earnings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:1/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:12/8/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • NOTE: AS TO ALFRED BESELER AND MINDY HOMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:10/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING FORM OF JUDGMENT AS TO ALFRED BESELER AND MINDY HOMES

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Rose Brkic, Amount: $949.91, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Rose Brkic, Amount: $4,901.31, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Rose Brkic, Amount: $1,355.13, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Rose Brkic, Amount: $2,578.42, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Alfred Beseler Judgment Against: Mindy Homes, Amount: $2,863.43, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Alfred Beseler Judgment Against: Mindy Homes, Amount: $949.91, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Alfred Beseler Judgment Against: Mindy Homes, Amount: $2,284.69, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Alfred Beseler Judgment Against: Mindy Homes, Amount: $4,901.31, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Alfred Beseler Judgment Against: Mindy Homes, Amount: $1,355.13, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Alfred Beseler Judgment Against: Mindy Homes, Amount: $2,594.33, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less