This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/22/2020 at 03:45:36 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Robert C Casey

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Robert C Casey. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Viola, Danielle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0904

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Viola, Danielle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendant

Robert C Casey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Penny Moore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Robert C Casey, Amount: $3,758.44, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Robert C Casey, Amount: $3,702.78, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Stipulation to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSFJ - Stipulation For Judgment (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ROBERT C CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less