This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:03:04 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Philip D Hilliker Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Philip D Hilliker. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0238

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Philip D Hilliker

Tina M Hilliker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shyla Freestone

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • ORD - Order (docket date:2/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • NOTE: ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons (docket date:2/9/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • PTT - Petition (docket date:2/9/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • NOTE: Petition for Order Discharging Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:2/9/2018) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(4))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:1/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:12/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:6/8/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • NOTE: TINA M HILLIKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • NOTE: PHILLIP D HILLIKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • NOTE: CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:3/8/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/8/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Philip D Hilliker Judgment Against: Tina M Hilliker, Amount: $7,319.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Philip D Hilliker Judgment Against: Tina M Hilliker, Amount: $2,181.32, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Philip D Hilliker Judgment Against: Tina M Hilliker, Amount: $3,344.53, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less