This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 06:23:16 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Oren Wheeler

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Oren Wheeler. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Viola, Danielle and White, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0907

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Viola, Danielle

White, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendant

Oren Wheeler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Penny Moore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Oren Wheeler, Amount: $5,826.01, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Oren Wheeler, Amount: $1,832.55, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Oren Wheeler, Amount: $2,744.93, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Default Judgment Without Hearing and Affidavit in Support of Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Entry of Default and Re Military Service Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OREN WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less