This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:03:27 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Margaret Gallegos

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Margaret Gallegos. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0248

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendant

Margaret Gallegos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lindsay Hughes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2017
  • ORD - Order (docket date:6/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • NOTE: ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE (NON-EARNINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • ORD - Order (docket date:6/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • NOTE: ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE (NON-EARNINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • PTT - Petition (docket date:6/8/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • NOTE: Petition for Order Discharging Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • PTT - Petition (docket date:6/8/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • NOTE: Petition for Order Discharging Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons (docket date:6/7/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons (docket date:6/7/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2017
  • AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:4/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NOTE: Application for Entry of Default and RE Military Service Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/7/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • NOTE: MARGARET GALLEGOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:4/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:3/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Margaret Gallegos, Amount: $11,344.62, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Margaret Gallegos, Amount: $2,969.25, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Margaret Gallegos, Amount: $2,762.85, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less