This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:02:54 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Lisa M Schwegman Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Lisa M Schwegman. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0234

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Lisa M Schwegman

William L Schwegman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lindsay Hughes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2017
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:3/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • NOTE: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment (docket date:3/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • NOTE: LSA M SCHWEGMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • NOTE: WILLIAM L SCHWEGHMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:3/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: William L Schwegman Judgment Against: Lisa M Schwegman, Amount: $1,468.88, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: William L Schwegman Judgment Against: Lisa M Schwegman, Amount: $1,506.04, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: William L Schwegman Judgment Against: Lisa M Schwegman, Amount: $7,370.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: William L Schwegman Judgment Against: Lisa M Schwegman, Amount: $496.02, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: William L Schwegman Judgment Against: Lisa M Schwegman, Amount: $2,467.06, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less