This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:06:54 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Jeffrey A Raiffie

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Jeffrey A Raiffie. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0259

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendant

Jeffrey A Raiffie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lindsay Hughes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2017
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:10/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:9/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:9/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/9/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • NOTE: Affidavit of Service upon Defendant by Publication and Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:7/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • NOTE: TO EXTEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:6/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • NOTE: Motion to Extend

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/6/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Jeffrey A Raiffie, Amount: $7,827.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Jeffrey A Raiffie, Amount: $2,306.06, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Jeffrey A Raiffie, Amount: $2,330.57, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less