This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:09:09 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Isidro Castaneda Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Isidro Castaneda. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0320

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Isidro Castaneda

Francisca Guzman De Pineda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shyla Freestone

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:8/3/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • NOTE: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:7/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:7/5/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • NOTE: ISIDRO CASTANEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • NOTE: FRANCISCA GUZMAN DE PINEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:6/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:6/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Isidro Castaneda Judgment Against: Francisca Guzman De Pineda, Amount: $1,871.98, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Isidro Castaneda Judgment Against: Francisca Guzman De Pineda, Amount: $9.49, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Isidro Castaneda Judgment Against: Francisca Guzman De Pineda, Amount: $1,515.19, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less