This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:07:09 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Desert Best Distributing L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Desert Best Distributing L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitten, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0266

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Whitten, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Desert Best Distributing L L C

Jacqueline S Griffin

Frank R Ruiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Penny Moore

Defendant Attorney

Michael Galloway

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • NOTE: AS TO DEFENDANT FRANK R. RUIZ ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar (docket date:11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR AND RULE 16(b)(3) DEADLINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar (docket date:11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Continue Case on Dismissal Calendar and Rule 16(b)(3) Deadlines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:11/7/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • NOTE: Notice of Lodging Form of Judgment as to Defendant Frank R. Ruiz Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:9/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:5/5/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:5/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:5/2/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/4/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • NOTE: JACQUELINE S GRIFFIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/4/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • NOTE: DESERT BEST DISTRIBUTING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Frank R Ruiz, Amount: $20,391.42, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less