This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 06:07:46 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS David R Seabrook

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against David R Seabrook. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Viola, Danielle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0905

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Viola, Danielle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendant

David R Seabrook

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Penny Moore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: David R Seabrook, Amount: $2,358.79, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: David R Seabrook, Amount: $1,509.58, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: David R Seabrook, Amount: $3,935.80, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Stipulation to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSFJ - Stipulation For Judgment (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DAVID R SEABROOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less