This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/20/2018 at 11:08:50 (UTC).

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue VS Corbin T Jones Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Corbin T Jones. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Whitten, Christopher and Abramson, Lindsay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0311

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Whitten, Christopher

Abramson, Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue

Defendants

Corbin T Jones

Chelsea C Jones

Others

Bank Of America N A

Wells Fargo Bank National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Penny Moore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2017
  • ORD - Order (docket date:10/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • NOTE: DISCHARGING GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • ORD - Order (docket date:10/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • NOTE: DISCHARGING GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PTT - Petition (docket date:10/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTE: Petition for Order Discharging Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:10/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTE: Petition for Order Discharging Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:10/13/2017) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(5))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ANG - Answer Of Garnishee (docket date:10/12/2017) (filing party: Garnishee Defendant(4))

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • NOTE: Application for Entry of Default and Re Military Service Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/5/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • NOTE: CHELSEA C JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/5/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • NOTE: COBIN T JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:6/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:6/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Corbin T Jones Judgment Against: Chelsea C Jones, Amount: $8,759.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Corbin T Jones Judgment Against: Chelsea C Jones, Amount: $2,189.75, Frequency: One Time, Type: Charges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Judgment For: State Of Arizona Department Of Revenue Judgment Against: Corbin T Jones Judgment Against: Chelsea C Jones, Amount: $3,615.24, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less